Daniels v. Arnold
Plaintiff: Ted Darnell Daniels
Defendant: Eric Arnold
Case Number: 2:2016cv00551
Filed: March 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/9/2019 REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. Plaintiff shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. Defendants to fi le any motion to opt out of the Post-Screening ADR Project no more than 60 days from the date of this order. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. (Henshaw, R)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ted Darnell Daniels signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/29/2019. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/12/16 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding th e filing of the complaint and shall obtain the assistance of an authorized prison official to complete the certificate portion of the application form. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice.(Dillon, M)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/22/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/14/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016) [Transferred from cand on 3/16/2016.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Darnell Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?