December 11, 2020 |
Filing
77
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/11/20 ORDERING the Custodian to produce by Zoom video conference Kordy Rice on 1/07/21 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk of court shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento and CKD)(Plummer, M)
|
November 9, 2020 |
Filing
74
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/6/2020 SETTING a Settlement Conference set on 1/7/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The parties shall submit confidential settlement statements, no later than 12/28/2020, in accordance with this order. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the SVSP Litigation Office via fax or email. The deadline for defendants to file a joint pre-trial statement is VACATED pending further order of the court. (cc: CKD, ADR) (Yin, K)
|
September 3, 2020 |
Filing
65
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/03/20 ORDERING Plaintiff shall file and serve his pre-trial statement, and any motions necessary to obtain the attendance of witnesses at trial, on or before October 2, 2020. Defendants shall file their pre-trial statement on or before 30 days from the date of service of plaintiffs pre-trial statement. A pre-trial conference, as described in Local Rule 282, shall be conducted by the undersigned on the file only, without appearances, following submission of pre-trial statements.(Plummer, M)
|
June 12, 2020 |
Filing
52
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 06/12/2020 DIRECTING that: 1) Plaintiff's status report shall be filed and served within 30 days from the date of service of this order; 2) Defendants' status report shall be filed within 30 days after service of plaintiff's status report; and 3) The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail to all parties the form Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge, together with the instant order. (Tupolo, A)
|
June 10, 2020 |
Filing
51
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/9/2020 ORDERING that defendants' 50 objections to the findings and recommendations are OVERRULED. The 49 findings and recommendations are ADOPTED to the extent they are consistent with this order. Defendant Drake's 40 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED IN PART. All claims against Drake are DISMISSED with the exception of plaintiff's Eighth Amendment excessive force claim. Defendants Goodrich and McCord's 41 moti on for summary judgment is GRANTED IN PART. All claims against Goodrich are DISMISSED. All claims against McCord are DISMISSED with the exception of plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim excessive force claim. This action shall proceed solely on plaintiff's Eighth Amendment excessive force claim against defendants McCord and Drake. (Zignago, K.)
|
March 2, 2020 |
Filing
49
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 2/28/2020 RECOMMENDING defendant drake's 40 motion for summary judgment be granted; defendants Goodrich and McCord's 41 motion for summary judgment be granted in part and denied in part; and this action proceed on plaintiff's Eighth Amendment excessive force claim against McCord only. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K) Modified on 3/2/2020 (Yin, K).
|
May 29, 2019 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/29/2019 GRANTING 29 and 30 Motions Relating to Scheduling as follows: Defendants shall serve responses to plaintiffs first set of interrogatories within 45 days of the date of this order; Di scovery is re-opened to the extent plaintiff may file any motions to compel related to defendants response to his first set of interrogatories within 45 days of the date of service of defendants responses; and Dispositive motions are due within 120 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
|
January 30, 2019 |
Filing
28
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/29/2019 AMENDING 24 Discovery and Scheduling order and ALLOWING Defendants the ability to take Plaintiff's deposition via video-conference. (Henshaw, R)
|
August 29, 2018 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/29/2018 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kordy Rice. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00. The Director of the CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
|
September 18, 2017 |
Filing
12
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/18/2017 GRANTING 7 Request for Additional Time and GRANTING 9 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Henshaw, R)
|
October 31, 2016 |
Filing
6
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/28/16 denying 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court within 30 days from the date of this order, a proper application for leave to pro ceed in forma pauperis, or the appropriate filing fee. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a new form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend 5 is denied as unnecessary. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
|