Golden State Truck Sales, Inc. et al. v. Bay Trailer Sales, LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Golden State Truck Sales, Inc. and Dharminder Singh
Defendant: Bay Trailer Sales, LLC and Jonathan Emde
Case Number: 2:2016cv00580
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/7/2018 GRANTING 54 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; Not later than 30 days following the date Defendants are served with this Order, Defendants shall retain and substitute in new counsel. If Defendants fail to timely comply with this Order, the Court will impose sanctions, up to and including terminatingsanctions, upon no further notice to the parties.(Reader, L)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/31/2018 ORDERING defendants to SHOW CAUSE within 7 days. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's 42 Motion to Enforce be granted; Judgment be entered in plaint iffs' favor and against defendants; Plaintiffs' be awarded damages in the amount of $100,000, plus $35,058.30 in interest, and interest at a rate of 10% per annum; and Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees be denied without prejudice to filing a properly-supported motion for attorneys' fees. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Fabillaran, J)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/4/2018 GRANTING Plaintiffs' request to extend the time to file dispositional papers and DISCHARGING the 32 Order to Show Cause. The new deadline to file dispositional papers is 2/9/2018. (Zignago, K.)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/5/2017 ORDERING this matter has SETTLED. ORDERING that dispositional documents are to be filed not later than 9/19/2017. All hearing dates heretofore set in this matter are VACATED. (cc EFB) (Washington, S)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/7/2017 ORDERING the parties to disclose expert witnesses by 9/28/2017. (Michel, G.)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/02/17 ORDERING that the 05/04/17 Settlement Conference is RESET for 7/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan (cc: EFB). (Benson, A)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 4/18/17, ORDERING that the new deadline to disclose expert witnesses is 7/31/2017. All other dates in the Pretrial Scheduling Order and the Supplemental Pretrial Scheduling Order remain unchanged. (Kastilahn, A)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/23/17: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. Jury Trial set for 3/5/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/19/16: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/13/2017. Discovery due by 2/13/2017. The last day to hear dispositive motions shall be 7/27/2017. Settlement Conference set for 2/23/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden State Truck Sales, Inc. et al. v. Bay Trailer Sales, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden State Truck Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Jaskarn Singh Atwal
Represented By: Sean Gavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dharminder Singh
Represented By: Jaskarn Singh Atwal
Represented By: Sean Gavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Trailer Sales, LLC
Represented By: Timothy James Nally
Represented By: John Stuart Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Emde
Represented By: Timothy James Nally
Represented By: John Stuart Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?