Palma v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Ray Palma
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., National Default Servicing Corporation and Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00633
Filed: March 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/16/17, ORDERING that the hearing date of 8/30/2017 on defendants' motion for summary judgment is VACATED. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be dismi ssed with prejudice; and the Clerk be directed to close this case. Matter REFERRED to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/31/2017 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 45 are ADOPTED in FULL; The second cause of action for violation of California Civil Code Sec 2923.7 is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Reader, L)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/3/17 RECOMMENDING that the second cause of action for violation of California Civil Code § 2923.7 be DISMISSED with prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/19/17 ORDERING that Defendants' Ex Parte Application for motion to expunge lis pendens 39 is GRANTED. The notice of action pending against real property located at 12840 Riding Trail Drive, Wilton, California 95693 recorded in the office of the County Recorder of Sacramento on 3/10/16 at Book No. 20160310, Page 0709 is EXPUNGED. All law and Motion except as to discovery is left open, save and except that it shall be conducted so as to be completed by 7/12/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/13/2017 GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART 19 Motion to Dismiss. An Amended complaint remedying the 2923.7 claim deficiencies shall be filed within 14 days. In accordance with this court's minute order, this case is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for handling of pre-dispositive matters. (Donati, J)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/19/2016 ORDERING The court GRANTS in PART and DENIES in PART the parties' Stipulated Request 14 ; Plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint no later than 6/6/2016; Motion 11 to Dis miss, and Motion 9 to Remand is RESET to 7/29/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; the parties' request to extend the time for defendants to respond to plaintiff's intended first amended complaint is DENIED without prejudice; the parties may renew such a request upon plaintiff's filing of the first amended complaint.(Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palma v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Palma
Represented By: Armine Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan L. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Bryan L. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?