Davidson v. Warden
Petitioner: Carrington Davidson
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 2:2016cv00689
Filed: March 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/21/17 ORDERING that the Petitioner's Motion for Stay is DENIED; the Court again ADOPTS in full the Findings and Recommendations recommending the DENIAL of the habeas corpus petition; the Clerk shall reinstate the Judgment entered on August 28, 2017, 20 , and CLOSE this case; and No Certificate of Appealability shall be granted. (Becknal, R)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/31/2017 ORDERING Petitioner to file his Objections to 16 Findings and Recommendations on or before 8/12/2017. (Henshaw, R)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/11/2017 RECOMMENDING that 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied, no certificate of appealability be issued, and the Clerk to be directed to close the case. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/24/2016 GRANTING petitioner's 7 request to proceed IFP. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carrington Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?