Witte v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Witte
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Wachovia Mortgage and Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00691
Filed: April 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/07/17 DENYING 34 Motion for Reconsideration. (Benson, A.)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/22/2017 RECOMMENDING that the 8 Motion to Dismiss be granted; RECOMMENDING that the 1 Complaint be dismissed without leave to amend and that the Clerk of Court be directed to close the case; REFERRING this matter to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; ORDERING that any objections be filed within fourteen days. (Michel, G.)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 02/02/17 ORDERING that Wells Fargo shall file within 5 days a declaration attesting to the authenticity of the submitted documents. Any further objection by plaintiff shall be filed within 5 days thereafter. Should Wells Fargo fail to file a declaration, its request for judicial notice will be denied. Upon the filing of any declaration and objection, the matter ( 8 Motion to Dismiss) will stand resubmitted. (Benson, A)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/12/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 2 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to issue forthwith all process pursuant to FRCP 4. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff one USM-285 form, one summons, a copy of the complaint, this Court's scheduling order, and the forms providing notice of the Magistrate Judge's availability to exercise jurisdiction for all purposes. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the USM, 501 I Street, Sacramento, CA 95814 (tel. 916-930-2030).(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witte v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Melissa Coyle Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?