Allan v. Sahota et al
Plaintiff: Tristan D. Allan
Defendant: P. Sahota, S. Chaiken and Pursana-Nim
Case Number: 2:2016cv00695
Filed: April 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/7/2020 ADOPTING 52 Findings and Recommendations in full. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute and for failure to obey a court order. Defendants' 44 motion for summary judgment is DENIED as moot. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/12/19 ORDERING that attorney Thomas P. Feher is substituted in as attorney of record for defendant P. Sahota in place of Jeremy Duggan, Attorney General. (Plummer, M)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/30/19 ORDERING that, within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to defendants motion for summary judgment 44 .(Plummer, M)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/20/2018 GRANTING 43 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall serve responses to Defendant Sahotas interrogatories numbered 1-9, Defendant Porsonas interrogatories numbered 1-5, and Defendant Chaiken s interrogatories numbered 1-4, within 30 days after the date of service of this order. Plaintiff shall serve responses to Defendants requests for production numbered 1-12 within 30 days after the date of service of this order. The matters stated in Defendants requests for admission numbered 1-17 are deemed admitted. (Henshaw, R)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/13/18 GRANTING 39 Motion to modify the scheduling order. The current discovery deadline date of 3/20/18 shall be extended by 90 days to 7/19/18. The current pre-trial motion deadline of 6/12/18 shall be extended by 90 days to 9/10/18. All other directives in the courts September 27, 2017 scheduling order 28 and6 December 14, 2017 order 38 are to remain in full force and effect. (Plummer, M)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/18/17 TERMINATING AS MOOT 18 Motion to Dismiss. This action now proceeds on plaintiff's first amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/7/2017 REQUESTING defendants' counsel, as a courtesy, query the CDCR to ascertain the whereabouts of defendant Persona-Nim in accordance with this order. Defendants' counsel shall file and serve the appropriate response within 20 days of the file date of this order. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of counsel's response to provide the required service information. (Yin, K)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/23/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Tristan D. Allan. CDCR is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve a copy of this order and copy of Plaintiff's signed IFP on CDCR and copy of this order on Financial Department. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allan v. Sahota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristan D. Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Sahota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Chaiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pursana-Nim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?