Thomas v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Josh Thomas
Defendant: Brian Roberts, Edward Martinez, Robert Doyle, Guillermo Viera, Arthur Anderson, Ken Allen, Janice Eng, John Peck, Douglas Treisman, Gilbert Robles and Worthington Vogel
Case Number: 2:2016cv00724
Filed: April 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/11/2018 ADOPTING 38 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to the extent they are consistent with this order; Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is DISMISSED. CASE CLOSED. (Fabillaran, J)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/23/18 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court shall assign a district court judge to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's amended complaint be dismissed and this case be closed. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/18/2017 DENYING 28 Motion for Reconsideration. (Henshaw, R)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/09/17 ordering that, to the extent plaintiff requests that judgment be vacated in this manner by virtue of the courts receipt of plaintiffs amended complaint, plaintiffs request is denied. (Plummer, M)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/01/17 ordering this action is dismissed without prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Plummer, M)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/28/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's 20 request for an extension of time to file an amended complaint; plaintiff shall file his amended complaint within 30 days; failure to file an amended complaint within 30 days will result in dismissal; and plaintiff's 20 motion for the appointment of counsel is DENIED. (Yin, K)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/05/16 ordering plaintiffs November 22, 2016 motion for reconsideration is denied. Plaintiffs November 22, 2016 request to withdraw consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction is denied. Plaintif fs November 22, 2016 request for an extension of time is granted. Plaintiff is granted thirty days within which to file an amended complaint. Plaintiffs failure to file an amended complaint within 30 days will result in dismissal. Plaintiffs November 22, 2016 request for the appointment of counsel is denied. (Plummer, M)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/21/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint.(Dillon, M)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Josh Thomas signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/19/2016. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to th e Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/6/2016 ORDERING plaintiff's 8 motion for reconsideration is DENIED. Plaintiff's 8 request that this matter be stayed is GRANTED. Plaintiff need not pay the filing fee for this matter at this time. The Clerk shall administratively close the case. Plaintiff shall inform the court within 14 days of the Ninth Circuit rendering a decision on his appeal in 1:15-cv-0527 LJO DLB P. CASE STAYED. (Yin, K)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/16/16 ORDERING that 6 Motion to Proceed IFP is DENIED; Plaintiff is granted 14 days within which to pay the $400 filing fee for this action. Failure to pay the filing fee within 14 days will result in dismissal.(Dillon, M)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/11/16 ordering plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermo Viera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Eng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Treisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthington Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?