EZ Pedo, Inc. v. Mayclin Dental Studio, Inc.
Plaintiff: EZ Pedo, Inc.
Defendant: Mayclin Dental Studio, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00731
Filed: April 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/10/2019 DISMISSING this action with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Huang, H)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/23/18 ORDERING Plaintiff's unopposed request for certification is GRANTED; the court's summary judgment ruling (ECF No. 60 ) is CERTIFIED under Rule 54(b); and the case is STAYED pending resolution of plaintiff's appeal. (Becknal, R)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/14/2018 GRANTING 42 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The DOE defendants are DISMISSED. The Final Pretrial Conference on plaintiff's remaining claims is set for 3/15/2018 at 2:30 p.m., with a jury trial date to be set at the pretrial conference. The parties' joint pretrial statement is due seven days before the conference. (Zignago, K.)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/28/2017 APPROVING the requested changes to the expert discovery deadlines; ORDERING that all other provisions of the pretrial scheduling order remain in effect. (Michel, G.)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/17/17 ordering ( Settlement Conference set for 3/24/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney.) (Plummer, M)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/5/2017 ORDERING the Completion of Discovery is due by 3/1/2017. (Donati, J)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/18/16 GRANTING the parties' stipulation to extend the deadline to respond to the complaint to July 22, 2016 to allow jurisdictional discovery as provided for by the parties' stipulation above. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EZ Pedo, Inc. v. Mayclin Dental Studio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EZ Pedo, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Fraidenburgh
Represented By: Michael Leon Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayclin Dental Studio, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Payson Gislason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?