Davis v. Ducrat
Petitioner: David M. Davis
Respondent: Clark Ducrat
Case Number: 2:2016cv00733
Filed: April 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sutter
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/18/18 RECOMMENDING that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/6/2017 GRANTING 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Respondent to file response to petition for writ of habeas corpus by and including 8/7/2017. (Henshaw, R)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/29/2017 ADOPTING IN FULL 28 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING 15 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice and with leave to amend; GRANTING the petitioner leave to (a) file an amended petition co ntaining only the three claims that he has exhausted or (b) file a motion to stay pursuant to Rhines, 544 U.S. at 277; CAUTIONING the petitioner that in the absence of an amended petition or a motion to stay, the Court will deem the 29 First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as the operative petition in this case. (Michel, G.)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/15/17 RECOMMENDING that respondent's June 10, 2016 motion to dismiss (ECF No. 15 ) be granted on exhaustion grounds and that the petition be dismissed without prejud ice and with leave to amend. Petitioner be granted leave within 30 days of the date of any order adopting this recommendation to either (a) file an amended petition containing only the three claims that he has exhausted or (b) file a motion to stay pursuant to Rhines, 544 U.S.at 277. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/11/16 GRANTING 19 Motion for Extension of time. petitioner has 30 days from the date this order is served to file his response. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of respondents motion to dismiss on petitioner with this order.(Dillon, M)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 [DISREGARD per to Chambers' request; Order not served by mail] ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/12/16 ORDERING that petitioner shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his re quest to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee; petitioners failure to comply with this order may result in this action being dismissed; and Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district.(Dillon, M) Modified on 4/12/2016 (Dillon, M).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Ducrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clark Ducrat
Represented By: Tami M. Krenzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?