Plummer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tatyana Plummer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv00753
Filed: April 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/11/2017; DENYING 14 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 24 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for defendant, and close this case. CASE CLOSED(Washington, S)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/27/17 ORDERING that the time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 5/5/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/20/2017. ORDERING that the time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED from 4/20/2017 to 4/28/2017. (Washington, S)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/1/2017 ORDERING that the time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED from 3/6/2017 to 4/20/2017. (Zignago, K.)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/26/17 ORDERING that defendant's due date for the response to plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 03/06/17. (Benson, A)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/4/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 1/4/2017. (Zignago, K.)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/7/2016 GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve the 6 Scheduling Order in Social Security Cases; ORDERING the plainitff to submit to the U.S. Marshal within fourt een days, a completed 5 Summons and copies of the 1 Social Security Complaint and to file a statement with the court of such service; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to serve all process without prepayment of costs within sixty days. (cc: U.S. Marshal) (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plummer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatyana Plummer
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?