Tyurina v. Urbana Tahoe TC LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elena Tyurina
Defendant: Urbana Tahoe TC LLC and Urbana Tahoe Beverage Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00759
Filed: April 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/12/2018 DISMISSING without prejudice: Crossclaim by Action Motorsports of Tahoe, Inc. and Counterclaim of Urbana Tahoe Beverage Company, LLC and Urbana Tahoe TC LLC. Parties associated with Crossclaim and Counterclaim terminated. (Fabillaran, J)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/5/2018 FINDING that the settlement between the plaintiff and the defendant, Action Motorsports of Tahoe, Inc., is in good faith pursuant to the provisions of California Code of Civil Procedure section 877, et seq.; GRANTING 39 Motion for good faith settlement; DISMISSING all claims for non-contractual indemnity and contribution by defendants Urbana Tahoe TC LLC and/or Urbana Tahoe Beverage Company, LLC, dba Beach Retreat and Lodge at Tahoe, as to Action Motorsports of Tahoe, Inc. with prejudice. (Michel, G.)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/2/18 ORDERING that the hearing re 37 Motion for Summary Judgment, 39 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement is MOVED from 2/22/18 to 3/22/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/16/18, ORDERING that the hearing on 39 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement is CONTINUED to 2/22/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kastilahn, A)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/11/18 ORDERING that the hearing date on the Motion 37 by defendants Urbana Tahoe TC LLC and Urbana Tahoe Beverage Company, LLC for Summary Judgment and partial Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, an order treating specified facts as established is hereby MOVED from 2/8/18 to 2/22/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/19/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's 30 Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice to renewal. The 12/22/2017 hearing is VACATED. (Zignago, K.)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/1/17, ORDERING that the designation of expert witnesses deadline is EXTENDED to 1/31/2018, and the deadline to designate supplemental expert witnesses is due 20 days thereafter. The close of non-expert discovery is EXTENDED to 12/29/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/3/2017 EXTENDING Expert Disclosure Cutoff Date to 12/11/2017. (Donati, J)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER TO PERMIT ADDITIONAL DEPOSITIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/18/2017. (Washington, S)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/9/2017 ORDERING that the deadline for completion of discovery is EXTENDED from 8/28/2017 to 11/30/2017. (Zignago, K.)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/29/16 ORDERING that all Discovery shall be completed by 8/28/2017. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/26/2017. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, t emporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 2/22/2018. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/17/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties shall file, not later than 5/10/2018, a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement. A Jury Trial is set for 7/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties estimate a trial length of 20-25 days. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyurina v. Urbana Tahoe TC LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Tyurina
Represented By: Michael Albert Kelly
Represented By: Valerie Nicole Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urbana Tahoe TC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urbana Tahoe Beverage Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?