Lee v. Bluestem Brands, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gregory Lee
Defendant: Bluestem Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00838
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/19/2017 ORDERING that deadlines are CONTINUED as follows: The parties' joint statement summarizing law and motion practice heard by the Court to date shall be due 6/30/2017; Th e discovery completion deadline is CONTINUED to 7/14/2017; The dispositive motion filing date is CONTINUED to 8/22/2017; The dispositive motion hearing date shall be 9/19/2017 at 1:30 PM; The parties joint pretrial statement shall be filed by 11/9/2017; The Final Pretrial Conference is RESET to 11/17/2017 at 11:00 AM; Trial in this matter is CONTINUED to 1/8/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Zignago, K.)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/26/17. (Benson, A)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/16/16 ORDERING that the 11 Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order is NOT APPROVED. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Bluestem Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lee
Represented By: Amy Lynn Bennecoff Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluestem Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Hunter Randolph Eley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?