Rivera v. Peery
Petitioner: Vincent Rivera
Respondent: S. Peery
Case Number: 2:2016cv00856
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/5/2020 GRANTING petitioner 60 days to file his traverse. (Yin, K)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/7/2020 ADOPTING 55 Findings and Recommendations in full; GRANTING 45 Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING all claims appearing in 41 Second Amended Petition except part 1 of claim 2 and claim 4; and DIRECTING respondent to file and answer concerning the remaining claims within 30 days. (Coll, A)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/29/20 RECOMMENDING that respondent's motion to dismiss 45 be granted. All claims appearing in petitioner's second amended petition for writ of habeas corpus except part 1 of claim 2 and claim 4 be dismissed. Motion to Dismiss 45 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/26/2019 ORDERING, within 30 days, petitioner shall file an opposition to the pending 45 motion to dismiss or a statement of non-opposition. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Yin, K)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/6/18 GRANTING petitioner 30 days to file a Second Amended Petition. Respondent need take no further action until receiving further notice from the court. (Coll, A)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/26/2017 DENYING without prejudice 27 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Petition and RECOMMENDING 28 Motion to Stay be granted; Clerk be directed to a dministratively close this case; and Petitioner be ordered to either file a motion for leave to file an amended petition or file notice that Petitioner will proceed on the original petition within 30 days of exhaustion of state court remedies. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/28/16 ORDERING that petitioner shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee; Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vincent Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S. Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?