Spencer v. Virga et al
Plaintiff: Thurman Leroy Spencer
Defendant: Timothy Virga, Euraka Daye and B. Brizendine
Case Number: 2:2016cv00886
Filed: April 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/8/2018 ADOPTING 32 Findings and Recommendations in full, and DENYING 22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Huang, H)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/23/18 GRANTING 45 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff has 60 days from the date this order is served to file his objections. (Coll, A)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/26/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/15/18, GRANTING 42 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to file his objections and an amended complaint. Failure to file an amended complaint may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Kastilahn, A)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/31/2018 GRANTING 33 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to file his objections. (Henshaw, R)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/02/18 DENYING 28 , 29 plaintiff's motions for extension of time. Plaintiff's amended complaint 30 is DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days of the date this order is served. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 22 be denied. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 22 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/28/2017 ADOPTING 14 Findings and Recommendations in full and DENYING 13 Motion for Injunctive Relief. (Donati, J)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Thurman Leroy Spencer signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/3/2017. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forw ard to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/2/16 ORDERING that plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to submit the required trust account statement. Failure to comply with this order may result dismissal of this case. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Virga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurman Leroy Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Virga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euraka Daye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Brizendine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?