Hoffmann v. Lassen County et al.
Plaintiff: Kasey F. Hoffmann
Defendant: Lassen County, Lassen Family Services and Grace Poor
Case Number: 2:2016cv00946
Filed: May 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/2/2018 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 43 ADOPTED in PART and MODIFIES in PART; Defendants' 39 Motion for Attorney Fees is DENIED. (Reader, L)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/22/2018 RECOMMENDING the 39 Motion for Attorney Fees be denied. Referred to District Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (York, M)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/7/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff has 21 days from the date of this order to respond to 39 Motion, and the lack of response will be construed as non-opposition. Defendants will have 7 days from the date a response is filed to file a reply brief. (Hunt, G)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/26/17 Recommending that This action be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to join a necessary party re 1 , 10 , 8 , Remaining pending Motions, including Plaintiff 9;s Motion to Compel 31 and MOTION requesting issuance of subpoena 33 be DENIED as MOOT. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to these F&Rs due within twenty one days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/16/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall file his response to the motion to dismiss no later than 21 days from the date of this order; Defendants shall file their reply, if any, no later than seven (7) days from the filing of plaintiff's response. At the completion of briefing, the matter will be deemed submitted, without the need for oral argument, pursuant to Local Rule 230(l).(Becknal, R)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/29/2016 ORDERING that the Clerk shall STRIKE plaintiff's 15 Fourth Amended Complaint and accompanying "affidavit" from the docket. The 12 Third Amended Complaint is the operative complaint. (Zignago, K.)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/28/2016 ORDERING that plaintiff may proceed now to serve defendants, and pursue his ICWA claims against those defendants. Alternatively, plaintiff may delay serving those defendants, and attemp t to state Due Process and state law claims against them. If plaintiff elects to amend his complaint to state claims other than under the ICWA, he has thirty days so to do, and he may skip the following service instructions (Nos. 3-7). If plaintiff elects to proceed now on his ICWA claims alone, then within thirty days, plaintiff must return the materials for service of process that are enclosed with this order. Service is appropriate for the following defendants: Lassen County; Lassen Family Services; Dena Bovee; Grace Poor; Katherin Nielson; and D. Nichols (CCCFS, OA III). The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue forthwith, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve within ninety days of the date of this order, all process pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4, without prepayment of costs. The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff, for each defendant: one USM 285, one summons, a copy of the complaint, and an appropriate form for consent to trial by a magistrate judg e. Plaintiff is directed to supply the U.S. Marshal, within 15 days from the date this order is filed, all information needed by the Marshal to effect service of process, and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. (Zignago, K.)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/25/16 DISMISSING 10 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint with LEAVE to AMEND. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to amend the Complaint. If plaintiff fails to comply with this order in a timely manner, the undersigned may recommend that this action be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (Washington, S)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/20/16 ORDERING that that plaintiff is an inmate in a county jail, however, this lawsuit does not challenge conditions of confinement. The Clerk shall randomly assign a district judge to this case ; this case has been ASSIGNED to U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez; Magistrate Judge Allison Claire remains the Magistrate Judge assigned. The case number on all future filings shall be: 2:16-cv-0946 JAM AC PS. The 8 First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days. (Benson, A)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/24/16 ORDERING that that the Sheriff of Shasta County or a designee shall collect from the prison trust account of Kasey F. Hoffman an initial partial filing fee and shall forward the amount to the Clerk of the Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit on the Sheriff of Shasta County. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffmann v. Lassen County et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasey F. Hoffmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lassen County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lassen Family Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Poor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?