Gifford v. Puckett, et al
Plaintiff: Roger Gifford
Defendant: Roger Puckett , Sr., Patricia Slote, Lee Buckley, Melissa Peterson, Robert Winston, Julie Bowles, Clint Dingman, Ernest Goff, Hornbrook Community Services District, Hornbrook Community Bible Church, Inc., Kirsher, Winston, & Boston, LLC and Basic Laboratory, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00955
Filed: May 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/10/2018 in RESPONSE to 80 USCA Referral Notice, for application in USCA Case No. 18-15779. (cc: 9th Circuit) (York, M)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/27/2018 ADOPTING 69 Findings and Recommendations as set forth in this order; To the extent the Second Amended Complaint contains claims based on activity pre-dating 6/15/2015 and stated agains t the defendants common to plaintiff's prior case discussed in the F&R, those portions of the Second Amended Complaint are DISMISSED on res judicata grounds. The balance of plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED based on Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Fabillaran, J)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/17/17 RECOMMENDING that the Second Amended Complaint be DISMISSED on res judicata grounds to the extent that the claims therein pre-date 6/15/15, and are stated against t he defendants common to both actions identified previously;Plaintiff' Second Amended complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant toFederal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b); or, in the alternative, that: Plaintiff's Second Amended complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant toFederal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6); the Clerk should CLOSE this file. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 30 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/1/17 ORDERING that the court summarily overrules plaintiff's 66 objections. The court warns plaintiff that future unauthorized filings may result in sanctions including dismissal. (Kastilahn, A)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/19/2017 DENYING 61 Motion for Reconsideration. (Michel, G.)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/2/2017 ORDERING that: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, within twenty (20) days of this Order, or no later than 5/22/2017 why sanctions should not be imposed for plaintiff's failure to obey a valid court order. (Becknal, R)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/6/17 ORDERING Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the motions to dismiss, 48 , is DENIED as the lack of an operative complaint moots the motions; Plaintiff's Motion for Early Discovery contained within 48 , is DENIED as there is no operative complaint pending; the matters set forth in paragraphs 1 and 2 from the court's calendar of 5/18/17 are VACATED from calendar; All Motions to Dismiss, ECF Nos. 28 , 32 , 34 , 35 , 36 and 46 are VACATED from calendar as moot; the default entered re Lee Buckley, 52 , is STRICKEN as no default should be entered on the now stricken Second Amended Complaint filed in violation of the court's previous orders. (Becknal, R)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/5/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's IFP status is WITHDRAWN. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. The amended complaint shall bear the title "Second Amended Complaint." (Kastilahn, A)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/24/16 ORDERING that plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/17/16: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 5 , is DISMISSED. Plaintiff is granted thirty days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. (Kaminski, H)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/26/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED. Plaintiff is GRANTED thirty days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gifford v. Puckett, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Puckett , Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Slote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Dingman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornbrook Community Services District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornbrook Community Bible Church, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsher, Winston, & Boston, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basic Laboratory, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?