Demchuk v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Galina Demchuk
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv00977
Filed: May 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/5/2020 GRANTING 32 Motion for Attorney Fees and AWARDING plaintiff's counsel $6,000 in fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). (Coll, A)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/8/18 GRANTING 29 Motion for Attorney Fees. IT IS ORDERED that defendant pay plaintiff'S Atorney fees in the amount of $4,000 pursuant to the EAJA in accordance with this stipulation. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/27/2017 GRANTING 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 23 Commissioner's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; REMANDING this matter for further consideration consistent with this order; and DIRECTING Clerk to enter judgment in Plaintiff's favor. CASE CLOSED. (Henshaw, R)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/27/17 ORDERING that for good cause shown on the basis of this stipulation, the requested extension of plaintiff's time to file a reply brief is extended to June 26, 2017 and the reply brief is deemed timely filed. (Becknal, R)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/3/17 ORDERING that Defendant's Motion for Summary of Judgment is due Thursday 6/1/2017.(Becknal, R)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/27/17 ORDERING that Defendant shall have a first extension of time of 30 days from today to file her MSJ. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/17/16 ORDERING that the time for plaintiff to file a motion for summary judgment brief is extended to 11/28/2016. (Kastilahn, A)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/10/16 GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk is directed to issue process. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal an original and 5 copies of the completed summons, 5 copies of the complaint, and 5 copies of the scheduling order, and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demchuk v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galina Demchuk
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Brenda Pullin, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?