Johnson v. Kumar et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Krishna G. Kumar and Nalini K. Kumar
Case Number: 2:2016cv00978
Filed: May 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/9/17, GRANTING plaintiff's 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants are enjoined to "alter facilities to make such facilities readily accessible to and useable by individuals with disabilities" to the extent required by the ADA. 42 U.S.C. § 12188(a)(2). The Court also AWARDS plaintiff statutory damages in the amount of $8,000. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/20/2017 DENYING 19 Motion to Compel without prejudice to renewal; VACATING the hearing on said motion set for 9/22/2017. (Michel, G.)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/5/2017 GRANTING 19 Motion to Compel. Within twenty-one days of the 9/1/2017 hearing defendants shall produce to plaintiff the requested discovery; and Within twenty-one days of the 9/1/2017 defendants' attorney, Bruce A. Neilson, shall pay plaintiff $1,200 in sanctions. (Washington, S) Modified on 9/6/2017 (Washington, S).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Kumar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krishna G. Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nalini K. Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?