Lawson v. California Service Company et al
Plaintiff: KaShonda Lawson
Defendant: California Service Company, Paul Vitelli, Sherri Gebhart and Susie Hudson
Case Number: 2:2016cv00990
Filed: May 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/16/2017 ORDERING this case DISMISSED with prejudice and with each side to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 4/18/17 ORDERING that the deadline to complete discovery in this matter is CONTINUED to 11/11/17. The new deadline to complete discovery shall be used as the date by which to calculate all deadlines set in the initial order by reference to the discovery cutoff date (e.g. deadline for disclosure of experts, deadline to file dispositive motions, deadline to file Notice of Trial Readiness).(Kastilahn, A)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/17/2016 ORDERING that the time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED through and including 9/26/2016. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. California Service Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KaShonda Lawson
Represented By: Joshua H. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Vitelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Gebhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susie Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?