Polk v. Placer County et al
Plaintiff: Darrell E. Polk
Defendant: Placer County, Edward Bonner and CFMG
Case Number: 2:2016cv01034
Filed: May 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/17/2017 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 16 motion, and ADVISING plaintiff that documents filed since the closing date will be disregarded and no orders will issue in response to future filings. (Yin, K)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/26/2017 DISMISSING this action without prejudice. CASE CLOSED.(Yin, K)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/04/17 ordering withi 14 days, plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/21/16. (Plummer, M)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Darrell E. Polk signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/31/2016. The Sheriff shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and fo rward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Placer County. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk v. Placer County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell E. Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placer County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFMG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?