Smith v. California Correctional Health Care Services et al
Plaintiff: Tom Smith
Defendant: California Correctional Health Care Services, California Department of Corrections, Alicia Bulin and Salinas Valley State Prison Department of Mental Health
Case Number: 2:2016cv01038
Filed: May 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 06/18/19 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 03/13/19 ORDERING plaintiff's first amended complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/31/2017 ADOPTING 11 Findings and Recommendations in so far as they dismiss the case. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED, with leave to amend, for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff's motions are DISREGARDED and DENIED as moot. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of this order. (Donati, J)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/10/17 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's complaint be dismissed, without leave to amend, for failure to state a claim, and the motions for summary judgment (Docs. 6 , 7 ) and for filing of evidence (Doc. 9 ) be disregarded and denied as moot. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. California Correctional Health Care Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Bulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salinas Valley State Prison Department of Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?