Farren et al. v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Bettina L. Farren and Steve Farren
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Quality Loan Service Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv01077
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 23:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/17/17 ORDERING that Defedants' MOTION to DISMISS is GRANTED and the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/27/16 ORDERING that Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint is CONTINUED to 1/6/2017. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/22/16; GRANTING 25 Motion to Dismiss as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. only. (Washington, S)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/8/2016 DENYING 13 Motion for TRO. (Donati, J)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/26/2016 ORDERING that the deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading is EXTENDED to 7/1/2016. All related deadlines are also continued accordingly. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farren et al. v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettina L. Farren
Represented By: John Steve Sargetis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Farren
Represented By: John Steve Sargetis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan L. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank
Represented By: Bryan L. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Rafael Ramon Garcia-Salgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?