Malaivanh v. Humphreys College et al
Plaintiff: Leanna Malaivanh
Defendant: Humphreys College, Jesse De La Cruz and JSD Consultations
Case Number: 2:2016cv01081
Filed: May 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/16/2017 DENYING 39 Motion to Dismiss; ORDERING the plaintiff to file answer to the 34 Counterclaim within twenty-one (21) days. (Michel, G.)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/1/17 ORDERING that the parties' deadline to file dispositive motions is EXTENDED to 10/6/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/11/17. The Court GRANTS both Motions to Dismiss the complaint 8 , 20 with leave to amend. Any amended complaint shall be filed within fourteen (14) days of the filed date of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/6/17, ORDERING that Initial disclosures shall have been completed by 1/27/2017. All discovery shall be completed by 1/24/2018. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/2/2017, and rebuttal of expert witnesses disclosure due by 12/4/2017. All expert discovery shall be completed by 1/24/2018. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency appl ications, shall be heard no later than 8/11/2017. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 3/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The parties shall file a joint pretrial conference statement by 2/16/2018. The Jury Trial is SET for 4/9/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Trial briefs are due by 3/26/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/20/16 ORDERING that defendants Jesse De La Cruz's and JSD Consultations's 7 motion to stay this suit pending the resolution of the criminal proceedings is GRANTED. All other dates in this case, including the scheduled hearing date for defendant Humphreys College's 8 pending motion to dismiss are VACATED. The parties are directed to file a report on the status of the criminal proceeding with the court by 11/30/2016, or within seven (7) days of that proceeding's termination, whichever is sooner. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malaivanh v. Humphreys College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanna Malaivanh
Represented By: Grant A. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humphreys College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse De La Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSD Consultations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?