Nationwide Insurance Company of America et al v. Gomez et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide Insurance Company of America and AMCO Insurance Company
Defendant: Eliset Gomez
Case Number: 2:2016cv01114
Filed: May 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/28/2017 GRANTING 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 25 Motion for Summary Judgment; and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to enter judgment in Plaintiffs' favor and close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Henshaw, R)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/10/2016 STAYING all discovery pending the ruling on the parties' anticipated Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment, AUTOMATICALLY LIFTING the stay if said motions do not dispose of the case entirely and ORDERING the parties to make initial disclosures under F.R.Cv.P. Rule 26 within fourteen (14) days of the date the order on the anticipated Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment is filed; ORDERING that discovery be completed six months from that date; ORDERING the parties to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness 90 days from the close of fact discovery; ORDERING the parties to file Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by 2/13/2017; ORDERING that all other procedures, dates, and deadlines set forth in the 4 Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order remain unchanged. (Michel, G.)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/3/2016 ORDERING that all discovery is STAYED pending a ruling on the parties' anticipated cross-motions for summary judgment. The parties are further ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than 90 days from the close of fact discovery. All other procedures, dates, and deadlines set forth in the 4 Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order are to remain unchanged by this Order. (Butolph, J)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/16/2016 ORDERING that the default entered against Eliset Gomez on 7/13/2016 is hereby SET ASIDE and the answer to the complaint is due no later than 30 days from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/19/2016 GRANTING 10 Request for Extension of Time. Within ninety (90) days of service of the complaint on any party, or from the date of removal, the parties shall confer as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and shall prepare and submit to the Court the Rule 26(f)(3) discovery plan within fourteen (14) days of the parties' conference. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Insurance Company of America et al v. Gomez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Represented By: David Phillip Borovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: David Phillip Borovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliset Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?