Perry v. Commissioner
Plaintiff: Rowland Gene Perry
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01116
Filed: May 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/12/18 32 GRANTING plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $5,529.91. (Benson, A.)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/4/2017 ORDERING presently pending before the court is plaintiff's 32 motion for attorneys' fees. If the Commissioner wishes to oppose this motion, she must do so within 30 days of the date of this order. (Becknal, R)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/24/2017 GRANTING 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 26 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; This matter is REVERSED and REMANDED to the Commissioner for an immediate award of benefits; The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for plaintiff, and close this case. CASE CLOSED(Washington, S)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/5/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff is GRANTED a 14 day extension of time to file a response brief in support of his Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's brief is due 6/16/2017. (Zignago, K.)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/19/17 ORDERING that the due date for defendant's response to the 21 Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 05/19/17; any reply is due 06/02/17. (Benson, A)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/28/17 ORDERING that the date for defendant to respond to plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 04/19/17; any reply is due 05/03/17. (Benson, A)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/6/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff's brief is due on 2/16/2017. Defendant's reply brief on 3/20/2017, and Plaintiff's optional response brief on 4/3/2017. (Washington, S)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/23/2017 ORDERING that the Plaintiff's brief will be due on 2/2/2017, Defendant's reply brief on 3/6/2017, and Plaintiff's optional response brief on 3/20/2017. (Jackson, T)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/28/16. Plaintiff's brief will be due on 1/19/2017. Defendant's reply brief on 2/20/17, and Plaintiff's optional response brief on 3/6/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/28/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff's brief is due on 12/20/2016. Defendant's reply brief on 1/19/2017, and Plaintiff's optional response brief on 2/2/2017. (Zignago, K.)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/24/2016 ORDERING that plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is furth er directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. Within fourteen days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted. The United States Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty days from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowland Gene Perry
Represented By: Geri Nadine Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sharon Lahey, GOVT
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?