Firearms Policy Coalition Second Amendment Defense Committee et al v. Harris
Plaintiff: Firearms Policy Coalition Second Amendment Defense Committee, Kris Koenig, Michael Schwartz, Stephen Chollet, Tim Donnelly and Firearms Policy Coalition
Defendant: Harris and Kamala D. Harris
Case Number: 2:2016cv01144
Filed: May 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Bradley A. Benbrook. (Attachments: #1 E-Service Notice)(Benbrook, Bradley)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/5/2017 ORDERING that Defendant will pay Plaintiffs a total of $38,025.80 in costs and fees ($234.80 in costs and $37,791.00 in attorneys' fees). This payment will completely satisfy Defendant's obligation to pay costs and fees in this matter; Plaintiffs will not be entitled to any interest. Plaintiffs do not need to submit an affidavit or other evidence to the Court in support of an award of attorneys' fees otherwise required under Local Rule 293. (Zignago, K.)
April 4, 2017 Filing 26 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for the Parties' Settlement of Plaintiffs' Claim for Costs and Attorneys' Fees by Kamala D. Harris. (Chang, Peter)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/5/2016 ORDERING that this case is moot, and the action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
September 29, 2016 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER re #22 Joint Statement by Stephen Chollet, Tim Donnelly, Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Coalition Second Amendment Defense Committee, Kris Koenig, Michael Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 E-Service Notice)(Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 9/30/2016 (Zignago, K.).
September 29, 2016 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the Statement of Joint Statement Regarding Mootness; Stipulated Notice of Dismissal (ECF No. 22). The moving party is directed to file a proposed order for consideration of the filing. Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rule 101, the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in word processing format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. It is further ordered all due dates and hearings set in this matter are VACATED. (Deutsch, S)
September 29, 2016 Filing 22 JOINT STATEMENT regarding mootness; Stipulated Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiffs Stephen Chollet, Tim Donnelly, Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Coalition Second Amendment Defense Committee, Kris Koenig, Michael Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 E-Service Notice)(Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 9/30/2016 (Zignago, K.).
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/17/2016 ORDERING that the 10/6/2016 hearing on Plaintiffs' #16 Motion for Summary Judgment is CONTINUED to 10/20/2016 at 02:00 PM. (Zignago, K.)
September 15, 2016 Filing 20 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Hearing Currently Set for October 6, 2016, re #16 Motion for Summary Judgment by Kamala D. Harris. (Chang, Peter)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/8/16: HEARING as to #16 Motion for Summary Judgment is continued to 10/6/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
September 2, 2016 Filing 18 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance to Oct. 6, 2016, of Hearing re #16 Motion for Summary Judgment by Kamala D. Harris. (Chang, Peter)
August 24, 2016 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in support of #16 Motion for Summary Judgment by Stephen Chollet, Tim Donnelly, Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Coalition Second Amendment Defense Committee, Kris Koenig, Michael Schwartz. (Benbrook, Bradley)
August 24, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Stephen Chollet, Tim Donnelly, Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Coalition Second Amendment Defense Committee, Kris Koenig, Michael Schwartz. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities (DISREGARD Attachment 1 - Points and Authorities and REFER to Memorandum (ECF No. #17 ), #2 Statement, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order, #6 E-Service Notice)(Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 8/24/2016 (Kastilahn, A).
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/20/16. Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #6 , see also ECF No. #10 ) is GRANTED. Defendant is hereby ENJOINED from enforcing California Government Code section 9026.5 pending a final adjudication of this matter on the merits.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 9, 2016 Filing 14 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: After argument from counsel and for the reasons set forth on the record, the Court granted the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No.6). A written order is forthcoming. Plaintiffs' Counsel Bradley Benbrook adn Stephen Duvernay, present. Defendant's Counsel Peter Chang and Marc LeForestier, present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Kimberly Bennett. (Deutsch, S)
June 7, 2016 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Kamala D. Harris in Support of #10 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Chang, Peter) Modified on 6/7/2016 (Reader, L).
June 7, 2016 Filing 12 REPLY by Stephen Chollet, Tim Donnelly, Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Coalition Second Amendment Defense Committee, Kris Koenig, Michael Schwartz re #6 Motion for TRO. (Benbrook, Bradley)
June 3, 2016 Filing 11 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Kamala D. Harris in re #10 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chang, Peter)
June 3, 2016 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Kamala D. Harris to #6 Motion for TRO. (Chang, Peter)
May 31, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Peter H. Chang on behalf of Kamala D. Harris. Attorney Chang, Peter H. added. (Chang, Peter)
May 27, 2016 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Courtroom Deputy A. Shaddox-Waldrop for District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/27/2016: Plaintiffs' Application for a Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #6 ) is DENIED because Plaintiffs have failed to demonstrate that the irreparable harm they seek to prevent is sufficiently imminent to warrant extraordinary relief at this time. The court hereby treats Plaintiffs' Application as a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and SETS the matter for hearing on June 9, 2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Defendant may file an opposition no later than one week from the date this minute order is electronically filed. Plaintiffs may file a reply no later than 2 court days after Defendant's opposition is electronically filed. (Shaddox-Waldrop, A) Modified on 5/27/2016 (Shaddox-Waldrop, A).
May 27, 2016 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Stephen Chollet, Tim Donnelly, Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Coalition Second Amendment Defense Committee, Kris Koenig, Michael Schwartz re #6 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. (Benbrook, Bradley)
May 27, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Stephen Chollet, Tim Donnelly, Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Coalition Second Amendment Defense Committee, Kris Koenig, Michael Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Bradley A. Benbrook, #3 Declaration of Kris Koenig , #4 Declaration of Stephen Chollett, #5 Declaration of Tim Donnelly, #6 Declaration of Brandon Combs, #7 Declaration of Michael Schwartz, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Checklist, #10 Proof of Service)(Benbrook, Bradley)
May 27, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Kamala Harris served 05/27/16. (Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 5/31/2016 (Benson, A).
May 26, 2016 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L)
May 26, 2016 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kamala D. Harris* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bradley A. Benbrook* *Benbrook Law Group, PC* *400 Capitol Mall, Suite 1610* *Sacramento, California 95814*. (Reader, L)
May 26, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Stephen Chollet, Tim Donnelly, Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Coalition Second Amendment Defense Committee, Kris Koenig, Michael Schwartz (Benbrook, Bradley)
May 26, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory, Injunctive or Other Relief against All Defendants by Firearms Policy Coalition Second Amendment Defense Committee, Firearms Policy Coalition, Kris Koenig, Michael Schwartz, Tim Donnelly, Stephen Chollet. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6487889) (Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 5/26/2016 (Reader, L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firearms Policy Coalition Second Amendment Defense Committee et al v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris
Represented By: Peter H. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firearms Policy Coalition Second Amendment Defense Committee
Represented By: Stephen M. Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Koenig
Represented By: Stephen M. Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schwartz
Represented By: Stephen M. Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Chollet
Represented By: Stephen M. Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Donnelly
Represented By: Stephen M. Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firearms Policy Coalition
Represented By: Stephen M. Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?