June 25, 2021 |
Filing
116
SETTLEMENT ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT dated *6/25/2021* pursuant to order signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/25/2021. ACCORDINGLY 115 the foregoing Consent Decree is hereby APPROVED. Upon entry of the Consent Decree, all of City& #039;s claims against the U.S., and all of the United States' counterclaims against City in the referenced action, whether alleged in the complaints or otherwise, shall be DISMISSED with prejudice, as provided in the Consent Decree. There being no just reason for delay, this Court directs entry of final judgment in accordance with the terms of the Consent Decree and this Order. The Parties shall each bear their own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees. (Reader, L)
|
February 19, 2021 |
Filing
108
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/18/2021 RESETTING the deadline for the Joint Pretrial Conference Report to 5/14/2021, and the Pretrial Conference to 5/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Huang, H)
|
October 7, 2020 |
Filing
98
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/6/2020 ORDERING a Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with a Joint Pretrial Statement due by 3 /12/2021. At least one of the attorneys who will conduct the trial for each of the parties shall attend the Final Pretrial Conference. Theparties should be prepared to confirm a trial date within 60 to 120 days from the date of the Final Pretrial Conference and should be available for trial accordingly. (Reader, L)
|
August 31, 2020 |
Filing
95
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/28/2020 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART the United States' 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Zignago, K.)
|
March 14, 2019 |
Filing
72
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/13/19 ORDERING that the hearing date for the United States' motion for summary judgment is MOVED to 6/28/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 3. The United States shall file its motion for summary judgment no later than the deadline set forth in the Local Rules based on the revised 6/28/2019 hearing date. (Kastilahn, A)
|
January 25, 2019 |
Filing
68
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/24/2019 GRANTING IN PART 67 Ex Parte Application. The 3/8/2019 hearing date for dispositive motions is VACATED and RESET for 4/19/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 3. (Huang, H)
|
September 14, 2018 |
Filing
66
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/13/18, ORDERING that the court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part defendants' 63 ex parte application and AMENDS the scheduling order as follows: Fact deposition cutoff for both parties due 10/1/18, Plaintiff's updated expert report based on facts developed in new depositions due 11/1/18, Defendants' updated expert report based on facts developed in new depositions due 12/1/18, Completion of expert depositions based on updated reports due 1/15/19, Last day to hear dispositive motions is 3/8/19. (Kastilahn, A)
|
August 16, 2018 |
Filing
62
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/15/2018 ORDERING 34 the City's motion is GRANTED in PART. Specifically, the court permits the City 45 days to take up to a total of 14 depositions. The remainder of the City's motio n is DENIED, including the City's request for leave to amend its complaint to name the County of Placer as an additional defendant and the City's request for leave to modify the scheduling order in other respects, as explained above. In the next 14 days in a joint filing, the parties shall propose any further modification to the scheduling order needed as a result of this order. (Reader, L)
|
February 5, 2018 |
Filing
54
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/5/18: All discovery shall be completed by February 9, 2018. The United States noticed depositions of Mr. McLeod and to the City pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) shall be permitted to go forward at dates and times mutually agreeable to the parties, but in no event shall they be delayed beyond March 14, 2018. 51 Motion for Protective Order is hereby withdrawn. (Kaminski, H)
|
January 24, 2018 |
Filing
49
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/23/2018 ORDERING that 2:18-cv-00087-TLN-GGH is REASSIGNED from District Judge Troy L. Nunley to the undersigned and from Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as: 2:18-cv-00087-KJM-AC.(Hunt, G)
|
October 23, 2017 |
Filing
44
THIRD AMENDMENT TO THE PRETRIALSCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/20/17, ORDERING that the Discovery Cutoff is 2/9/2018, Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures due 3/14/2018, Defendants' Expert Disclosures due 5/ 14/2018, Supplemental Expert Disclosures due 6/11/2018, Completion of Expert Discovery due 7/13/2018 and the Hearing on Dispositive Motions is 8/24/2018. The Final Pretrial Conference, Trial Briefs' deadline and Trial are VACATED to be reset as necessary. (Kastilahn, A)
|
September 26, 2017 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/25/17 GRANTING the 22 motion to dismiss claims 1 to 3 of the complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Ordinarily a court should grant leave to amend unless it finds that amendment o f the claim would be futile. Here, the court finds the City's arguments that could be alleged in an amended complaint would not establish this court's jurisdiction, and amendment is thus futile. Accordingly, the dismissal here is without leave to amend. The City may proceed on its remaining claims not addressed by this order. In light of the City's pending motion to amend, ECF No. 34 , the City need not file an amended complaint consistent with this order now, but may wait to file any amendment untilafter the court resolves that new motion. (Becknal, R)
|
December 16, 2016 |
Filing
21
ORDER RE DISCOVERY signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/15/2016 informing the parties on discovery procedures in this case. (Reader, L)
|
December 12, 2016 |
Filing
19
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER NO. 1 signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/9/2016. (Michel, G.)
|
December 6, 2016 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/6/2017 ORDERING that the Court reinstates the First and Second Causes of Action in the 1 Complaint. (Zignago, K.)
|
November 16, 2016 |
Filing
14
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/16/16 ORDERING that the 13 Stipulation and Proposed Order is NOT APPROVED. (Benson, A)
|