Howard v. Williamson et al
Plaintiff: Gregory E. Howard
Defendant: S. Williamson, M. Bookout and E. Molten
Case Number: 2:2016cv01200
Filed: June 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/1/2019 DENYING 55 (Amended) Third Motion for Reconsideration. (Reader, L)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/13/2019 DENYING both 49 Motion for Reconsideration, Motion to Appoint Counsel, and 50 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. (Reader, L)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/22/2018 DENYING 45 Motion for Reconsideration. (Washington, S)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/6/2017 GRANTING defendants ( 19 - 4) request for judicial notice; CONSTRUING plaintiff's 31 "motion" and 33 "notice" as his op position to the motion for summary judgment; and DISREGARDING plaintiff's 35 "reply" as an unauthorized and untimely sur-reply. IT IS RECOMMENDED defendants' 19 motion for summary judgment be granted. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER adopting in full 30 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/1/17. Plaintiff's 25 motion for injunctive relief is DENIED without prejudice. (Kastilahn, A)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/21/17 ORDERING plaintiff's motions for extension of time 24 and 26 are partially granted. Plaintiff shall file his opposition to the motion for summar y judgment on or before 8/18/17. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief 25 be denied without prejudice. Motion for injunctive relief 25 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/10/2017 ORDERING defendants' 20 motion is GRANTED ; discovery is STAYED pending resolution of the motion for summary judgment; the 3/7/2017 discovery and scheduling order is VACATED; plaintiff's 21 motion filed 3/30/2017, is PARTIALLY GRANTED; and plaintiff shall file his opposition to the motion for summary judgment within 60 days. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed 14 days thereafter. (Yin, K)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 90 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy, Matt Caspar, within 3 0 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/30/17. (Dillon, M)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Gregory E. Howard signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/13/2016. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Williamson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory E. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bookout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Molten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?