Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Michael Joseph Williams
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01231
Filed: June 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Trinity
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/12/18 GRANTING 25 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. The matter is REVERSED and REMANDED to the Commissioner for an immediateaward of benefits. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/4/2018 ORDERING that the time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's MSJ be EXTENDED until 6/15/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/18/2018 GRANTING an extension of time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's MSJ. Defendant to file by 6/1/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/12/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, within 14 days, why his failure to file a motion for summary judgment should not be deemed a waiver of the right to file such a motion at any time, and why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Zignago, K.)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/6/18, ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment or remand is DUE on 2/12/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/27/17, ORDERING that the time for Defendant to answer the complaint and file a certified administrative record is EXTENDED until 12/14/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/12/2017 DENYING 11 Motion to Dismiss. The Commissioner must file the administrative record and an answer or other response on or before 12/1/2017. (Hunt, G)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/2/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall respond to the MOTION to DISMISS no later than 30 days from the date of this order; Defendant shall file her Reply, if any, no later than 14 days from the date of Plaintiff's response; and The motion will be taken under submission at the completion of the briefing.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/7/2016 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve the 5 Scheduling Order in Social Security Cases; ORDERING the plaintiff to submit to the U.S. Marshal within fourt een days, a completed 4 Summons and copies of the 1 Social Security Complaint and to file a statement with the court of such service; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to serve all process without prepayment of costs within sixty days. (cc: U.S. Marshal) (Michel, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Joseph Williams
Represented By: Robert Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?