Romingquet v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jessica Gutierrez Romingquet
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01249
Filed: June 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/20/17, ORDERING that Plaintiff's 16 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Commissioner's 19 cross-motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Judgment is entered for the Commissioner. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/13/2017 ORDERING that the time for defendant to file her opposition to plaintiff's opening brief is EXTENDED to 3/10/2017. (Zignago, K.)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/15/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall file a Motion For Summary Judgment on or before 1/11/2017. (Reader, L)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/15/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Request to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM. (cc: USM)(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romingquet v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Gutierrez Romingquet
Represented By: Shellie Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ellinor Ravenel Coder
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?