Leskinen v United States of America
Plaintiff: Laura Leskinen
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2016cv01265
Filed: June 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/29/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's 18 request is GRANTED, and plaintiff shall have until 12/22/16 to file her objections. (Kastilahn, A)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/16/2016 RECOMMENDING that the 9 Motion to Dismiss be granted and that the 1 Complaint be dismissed, in its entirety, with prejudice; REFERRING this matter to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; ORDERING that any objections be filed and served within fourteen days. (Michel, G.)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/7/16 ORDERING: the Status Conference CONTINUED to 2/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire; The parties shall comply with the briefing schedule set forth a t Local Rule 230; ORDERING 9 Motiong to Dismiss CONTINUED to 11/16/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire; and the parties shall file status reports in accordance with the Order Setting Status Conference.(Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leskinen v United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Leskinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?