De Bauer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ginger De Bauer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01280
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/22/2017 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, each side to bear its own costs. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/12/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff is GRANTED an extension of 30 days, through 5/10/2017, to file the Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kastilahn, A)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/7/16: The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve on plaintiff the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Bauer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger De Bauer
Represented By: Joseph Clayton Fraulob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?