Bellinder v. Wells Fargo, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Bellinder
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01289
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/15/2017 ORDERING that all claims of Plaintiff Richard Bellinder against Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A. are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/1/2017 ORDERING that all claims against Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. are DISMISSED, with prejudice. (Washington, S)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/2/17 ORDERING that all claims of Plaintiff Richard Bellinder against Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Plaintiff Richard Bellinder and Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC shall each bear their own costs and attorneys' fees.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/20/2017 ORDERING that all claims against Defendant Trans Union, LLC are DISMISSED with prejudice; each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Reader, L)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/28/16 ORDERING that Wells Fargo shall file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 8/8/2016. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellinder v. Wells Fargo, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bellinder
Represented By: Linda Dianne Deos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Kerry Cordill Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Carlton Robinson, PHV
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?