Alford v. Kernan, et al.
Plaintiff: David Patrick Alford
Defendant: Scott Kernan, Schumaker, Robert Rudas, Evalyn Horowitz, Christopher Smith and David Smiley
Case Number: 2:2016cv01305
Filed: June 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/16/20 DENYING 58 Motion for referral to the alternative dispute resolution program. (Plummer, M)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/29/2020 DENYING AS MOOT 60 Motion for Extension of Time. (Huang, H)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 09/24/20 ORDERING defendants shall file a response, indicating whether they are amenable to entering into alternative dispute resolution, within 7 days of the date of this order. In the event Defendants decline to enter into alternative dispute resolution, Plaintiffs response to Defendants pending motion for summary judgment 49 shall be due within 30 days of the date of service of Defendants response.(Plummer, M)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 7/22/2020 GRANTING 55 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner to file a response to 49 Motion for Summary Judgment by 9/21/2020. (Henshaw, R)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 05/21/2020 GRANTING 52 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file a response to defendant's summary judgement motion by 7/15/2020. (Tupolo, A)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 09/06/19 DENYING 38 Motion for Extension of time and STRIKING 41 reply filed on 6/27/19; GRANTING 42 Motion for Extension of time; DENYING 37 , 43 Motions to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff sha ll serve responses to defendants' discovery requests within 30 days of the date of this order. The court sua sponte extends the discovery cut-off date and dispositive motion filing deadlines established in the 6/05/19 scheduling order each by 60 days. (Plummer, M) Modified on 9/6/2019 (Plummer, M).
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/24/2018 STRIKING 21 Second Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Plaintiff's first amended complaint will be addressed by separate order. (Huang, H)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/28/17 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed 3/13/13, are ADOPTED in full with respect to plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief; Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief 3 is DENIED; and the matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. (Becknal, R)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/2/2017 GRANTING 18 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff to file amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/22/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 15 motion for the appointment of counsel; DENYING as unnecessary plaintiff's 16 motion for leave to amend; and plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/10/17 recommending that defendants Kernan, Doe, Smith and Smiley be dismissed from this action. Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief 3 be denied. MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 3 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/28/16 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of David Patrick Alford and forwa rd payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial) (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alford v. Kernan, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Patrick Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rudas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evalyn Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?