Knight v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Linda Knight
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01334
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/26/2018 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees under the EAJA (ECF No. 19 ) is GRANTED; Plaintiff is awarded attorneys' fees in the total amount of $5,799.67 pursuant to the EAJA. If the government determines that plaintiff does not owe a federal debt that qualifies for offset, payment may be made in the name of plaintiff's attorney. (Becknal, R)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/08/17. If the Commissioner wishes to oppose the Motion for Attorneys' fees, she must do so within 30 days of the date of this order. If the Commissioner submits an opposition, Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date the opposition is filed to file a reply if she wishes to do so.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/8/2017 GRANTING 13 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 16 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; REMANDING this matter to the Commissioner of Social Security for further consideration consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/29/2016 ORDERING that the time for defendant to file her responsive pleading is EXTENDED until 2/10/2017. (Zignago, K.)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/28/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's time to file her summary judgment motion is hereby extended to 11/22/2016, with all other deadlines extended accordingly. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Knight
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Donna Wade Anderson
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?