Shepard-Hall v. Gordon and Wong Law Group, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Judy Shepard-Hall
Defendant: Gordon and Wong Law Group, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01361
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/28/2017 ORDERING Judgment is hereby entered as follows: (1) in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff on all claims asserted in the Complaint; and (2) in favor of Defendant and against PLG in the amount of $30,007. (Yin, K)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/12/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Reconsideration, 22 is DENIED, and Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions 24 is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiff's counsel is sanctioned in the amount of $500.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/16/2017; GRANTING 9 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 10 Motion for Sanctions; Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to pay Defendant's attorneys fees associated with defending this frivolous suit in the amount of $29,507. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/6/2017 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 9 Motion for Summary Judgment, 10 Motion for Sanctions to 5/4/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; DENYING 11 Motion to Continue as moot. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepard-Hall v. Gordon and Wong Law Group, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon and Wong Law Group, P.C.
Represented By: Robert Travis Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Shepard-Hall
Represented By: Stuart Michael Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?