Lor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rozina Lor
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01400
Filed: June 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/24/2017 DENYING 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 18 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for defendant, and close this case. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/19/17 ORDERING that within seven (7) days of this order, counsel for plaintiff shall consent or decline to proceed before the Magistrate Judge in this case by completing and filing the form located at ECF No. [6-2]. Failure to timely comply with this order may result in sanctions. (Kastilahn, A)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/21/17 ORDERING that the Requested Extension of Plaintiff's time to file a reply brief is EXTENDED to 4/24/2017. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/16/2017 GRANTING the requested extension of plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment brief is EXTENDED to 3/2/2017. (Reader, L)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/26/2017 ORDERING that the requested extension of plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment brief is EXTENDED to 2/16/2017. (Zignago, K.)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/23/2016 GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve the 6 Scheduling Order in Social Security Cases; ORDERING the plaintiff to submit to the U.S. Marshal within four teen days, a completed 5 Summons and copies of the 1 Social Security Complaint and to file a statement with the court of such service; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to serve all process without prepayment of costs within sixty days. (cc: U.S. Marshal) (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rozina Lor
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?