Logan v. Patriot National, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Tammy Lynn Logan
Defendant: Patriot National, Inc., Patriot Risk Services, Inc., Patriot Claim Services, Inc. and Patriot Risk Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01407
Filed: June 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/4/2020 GRANTING Defendants' 50 unopposed Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/29/2019 GRANTING 40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mike Arias, Elise R. Sanguinetti and Alfredo Torrijos, attorneys with the law firm of Arias Sanguinetti Wang & Torrijos, LLP and Michael Patrick Doyle of Doyle LLP, are consequently relieved as counsel of record for Plaintiff effective upon the filing of a proof of service of this signed Order on Plaintiff. (Huang, H)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/6/2017 CONTINUING deadlines as follows: Discovery shall be completed by 1/18/2018; Initial Expert Disclosures due by 2/18/2018; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 3/16/2018; Dispositive Motions filed by 4/16/2018. (Zignago, K.)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 11/8/17. (Kastilahn, A)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 10/30/17, ORDERING that the Fact Discovery deadline is EXTENDED to 11/17/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/23/2017 EXTENDING All Pretrial Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 10/18/2017; Initial Expert Disclosures due by 12/18/2017; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 1/16/2018; and Dispositive Motions filed by 2/15/2018. (Donati, J)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/24/17. Fact Discovery New date 6/20/2017. Expert Disclosures New date 8/18/2017. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures New date 9/18/2017. Dispositive Motion Filing deadline 10/18/17.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan v. Patriot National, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot National, Inc.
Represented By: JoAnna L Brooks
Represented By: Britney Noelle Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Risk Services, Inc.
Represented By: JoAnna L Brooks
Represented By: Britney Noelle Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Claim Services, Inc.
Represented By: JoAnna L Brooks
Represented By: Britney Noelle Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Risk Management, Inc.
Represented By: JoAnna L Brooks
Represented By: Britney Noelle Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Lynn Logan
Represented By: Mike Montalban Arias
Represented By: Elise R Sanguinetti
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?