Griffin v. Dowilliams et al
Plaintiff: Charles E. Griffin, II
Defendant: Dorothy Dowilliams, Gabriel Williams, Marshall Saipher, Anise Adams, K. Martin, Jennifer Barretto and J. Lewis
Case Number: 2:2016cv01435
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/27/19 ADOPTING 93 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Kaminski, H)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/22/2019 GRANTING defendants' 77 motion to strike; and the exhibits submitted by plaintiff on 2/4/2019 are STRICKEN. IT IS RECOMMENDED that defendants' 61 motion for summary judgment be granted; and this case be closed. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/19/2019 ORDERING that upon reconsideration, the 88 Order is AFFIRMED. (Zignago, K.)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/19/19 DENYING 80 Motion to Stay without prejudice to renewal after the court issues findings and recommendations with respect to defendants' pending motion for summary judgment. (Plummer, M)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/10/19 DENYING 81 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/8/2019 GRANTING 72 Request for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants shall file their reply on or before 1/16/2019. (Huang, H)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/19/2018 GRANTING 67 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of this order in which to file an opposition to 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. Failure to file an opposition within 30 days will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Huang, H)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/26/18 GRANTING 62 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order to file an opposition to 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Coll, A)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/15/2018 DENYING 52 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel and DENYING 52 Motion for Court Order. (Henshaw, R)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/10/2018 GRANTING plaintiff's 50 request for an extension of time. The deadlines imposed in the court's 1/24/2018 scheduling and discovery order are all EXTENDED 90 days. Plaintiff's request for an order directing prison officials to provide plaintiff with access to his 6 boxes of legal material is denied.(Yin, K)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/19/2017 ADOPTING in FULL 37 Findings and Recommendations; All defendants other than defendants Dowilliams, G. Williams, Saipher, Malakkla and Adams are DISMISSED. (Washington, S)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/23/2017 ORDERING that service is appropriate for Adams, Dowilliams, Saipher, G. Williams and Malakkla. The Clerk shall send plaintiff forms for service to be completed and returned within 30 days, along with the Notice of Submission. IT IS RECOMMENDED all defendants other than defendants Adams, Dowilliams, Saipher, G. Williams and Malakkla be dismissed. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/16/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 34 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/16/2017 DENYING 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction without prejudice. (Henshaw, R)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 04/20/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's 24 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. (Benson, A)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/22/2017 GRANTING plaintiff 30 days to file a second amended complaint that complies with the terms of this order. If plaintiff does not file a second amended complaint within 30 days, this action will proceed on plaintiff's claim arising under the Eighth Amendment against defendant Dowilliams.(Yin, K)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/1/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Charles E. Griffin, II and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Dowilliams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Griffin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Dowilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Saipher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anise Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Barretto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?