Manning v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Byron Manning
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01458
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/3/20 ORDERING that Pursuant to the Ninth Circuit's instruction, this matter is hereby remanded back to the agency pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further proceedings consistent with the parties' stipulation filed in the appellate court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment and close this file. (Kaminski, H)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/2/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING defendant's 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Commissioner's final decision is AFFIRMED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment and close this file. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/12/2017 ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Reply to 21 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by 10/17/2017. (Michel, G.)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/26/17: Defendant has until August 28, 2017, to submit her response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kaminski, H)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/30/2017 GRANTING Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Proceed IFP. Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to theUnited States Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Manning
Represented By: Oliver Christophe Ehlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?