McMahon v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Gordon McMahon
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01459
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/18/2020 CONTINUING deadlines and pretrial dates as follows: Fact and Expert Discovery: 12/21/2020; Mid-Litigation Statements: 14 days prior to the close of discovery; Dispositive Motions Filed: 1/21/2021; Dispositive Motions Hearing: 3/9/2021. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 4/23/2021 at 10:00 AM and the Trial is SET for 6/7/2021 at 09:00 AM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/17/2020 CONTINUING deadlines and pretrial dates as follows: Fact and Expert Discovery: 9/28/2020; Mid-Litigation Statements: 14 days prior to the close of discovery; Dispositive Motions Filed: 10/13/2020; Dispositive Motions Hearing: 12/8/2020 at 1:30 p.m.. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 1/22/2020 at 11:00 AM and the Trial is SET for 3/8/2021 at 09:00 AM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/9/2020 ORDERING the parties shall confer on a joint stipulation extending time to conduct depositions by approximately 60 days, and submit this stipulation to District Judge Mendez; Plaintiff 's request to conduct an in-person deposition is DENIED. The court DECLINES to rule on any general objections to the scope of plaintiffs deposition of SPS's corporate representative. After the deposition has been scheduled, the parties shou ld contact the courtroom deputy with date and time of the deposition. On the day of the deposition, the court will make itself available by phone should the parties have a specific disagreement on the scope of any of plaintiff's inquiries; Def endant shall turn over to plaintiff any missing documents within 45 days. If defendant believes certain documents are privileged, unavailable, or otherwise subject to an objection, defendant shall inform plaintiff as much within this 45-day period; and Plaintiff shall submit amended responses to defendant's interrogatories by 7/24. (Becknal, R)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/23/2020 CONTINUING the following dates: Fact and Expert Discovery: 7/13/20204; Mid-Litigation Statements: 14 days prior to the close of discovery; Dispositive Motions filed: 7/28/2020; Dispositive Motions Hearing: 09/15/2020 at 1:30 p.m.; Final Pretrial Conference: 10/23/2020 at 10:00 a.m.; Trial: 11/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/20/19 CONTINUING the following dates: Fact and Expert Discovery: 05/04/20; Mid-Litigation Statements: 14 days prior to the close of discovery; Dispositive Motions filed: 05/26/20; Dispositive Motions Hearing: 07/14/20 at 1:30 p.m.; Final Pretrial Conference: 08/14/20 at 10:00 a.m.Trial: 09/21/20 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A.)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STATUS (Pre-trial Scheduling) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/8/19 ORDERING that all dispositive motions shall be filed by 2/25/2020. Hearing on such motions shall be on 3/24/2020 at 1:30 p.m.. All discovery shall be completed by 1/17/2020. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/8/2019 and supplemental expert disclosures due by 11/22/2019. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/1/2020 at 11:00 AM and the Jury Trial is set for 6/8/2020 at 09:00 AM, BOTH in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/7/18 DENYING the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's motion to amend (ECF No. 77 ). (Becknal, R)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 08/24/17 ORDERING that the 47 Motion to Dissolve the 17 Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. (Benson, A.)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 52 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/23/17. (Kaminski, H)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on *6/12/2017* Plaintiff's first amended complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety, in favor of Defendant, against Plaintiff pursuant to order; plaintiff shall recover nothing against defendant; defendant is entitled to recover from plaintiff the costs of suit in this action and may file a Memorandum of Costs. CASE CLOSED(Reader, L)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/30/17. The Court GRANTS Chase's Motion to Dismiss McMahon's FAC WITH PREJUDICE 43 . Additionally, the Court's Order re Filing Requirements limits reply memoranda in Motions to Dis miss to five pages. Order re Filing Requirements at 1, 6/27/16, ECF No. 5- 2. Violating the Order requires the offending counsel to pay $50.00 per page over the page limit to the Clerk of Court. Id. The Court also does not consider arguments made past the page limit. Id. Chase's reply brief exceeded the page limit by three pages. Chase's counsel must pay $150.00 no later than five days from this Order's date. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/25/2017 ORDERING 44 The Court STRIKES lines 21-28 on page 6; lines 1 through 5 on page 7; and the word "second" on line 4 on page 13 of the Court's 4/26/17 Order. McMahon may proceed against SPS on his second and fifth through seventh claims. SPS shall file its Amended Answer to the FAC within fifteen days of the date of this Order. (Reader, L)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 04/25/17 ORDERING that SPS's 30 Motion to Dismiss McMahon's first, second, and fourth claims is GRANTED with prejudice and DENIED as to McMahon's fifth through seventh claims. SPS shall file its Answer to the FAC within 20 days. McMahon's counsel is ORDERED to pay monetary sanctions of $250.00 within 7 days for exceeding page limit. (Benson, A)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/21/2017 ORDERING that the 25 motion to dissolve the preliminary injunction is CONTINUED to 3/21/2017 at 01:30 PM. The time for filing and serving opposing and reply papers is EXTENDED to 3/7/2017 and 3/14/2017, respectively. (Zignago, K.)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 08/22/16 ORDERING that the 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED; dfendants Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., their employees and agents, and any other persons acting with them or on their behalf are ENJOINED from transferring any ownership interest in or further encumbering the property located at 304 Seawind Dr., Vallejo, CA 94590 pending further order of this Court; plantiff need not post a bond. (Benson, A)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 07/11/16 ORDERING that, pursuant to 9 Stipulation, this case is STAYED pending the outcome of the current loan modification review; the hearing on the 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is RESET for 8/23/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. The TRO remains in place up to and including the date of the new hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Benson, A)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/28/2016 GRANTING 3 Motion for TRO. The TRO will be in place for 14 days or until the Court orders otherwise. Defendants shall not proceed with a foreclosure sale of the subject property for at lea st 14 days. Plaintiff to file his motion for preliminary injunction no later than 7/5/2016. A Hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction will be held 7/12/2016 at 1:30 pm. Defendants brief due 7/8/2016. Plaintiff's reply bried due 7/11/2016.(Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMahon v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon McMahon
Represented By: Eric Andrew Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Marvin B Adviento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?