G. et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: J. G., Bridgette McCullough, J. L., Antoinette Edmonds and Ezell Anderson, Jr
Defendant: United States of America, Tom Vilack, Kevin Concannon and Jocelyn Keb
Case Number: 2:2016cv01476
Filed: June 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/13/17 RECOMMENDING that the Defendant's motion to dismiss 20 be GRANTED and plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; The Clerk be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/21/17 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed April 6, 2017 are ADOPTED IN FULL; the minor plaintiffs, J.G. and J.L. are DISMISSED without prejudice.(Becknal, R)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/14/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to recuse the undersigned (ECF No. 21 ) is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/5/17 recommending that the minor Plaintiffs, J.G. and J.L. re be dismissed without prejudice. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to these F&Rs due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/23/2017 ORDERING: No later than 3/31/2017 plaintiffs shall obtain counsel for the named minor plaintiffs and file a substitution of attorneys. Failure to obtain counsel will result in a recom mendation this action be dismissed without prejudice as to the minor plaintiffs. GRANTING 13 Ex Parte Application for extension of time to file responsive pleading through and including 4/28/2017. DENYING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Washington, S)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/6/2017 ADOPTING 9 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING 4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Michel, G.)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/21/2016 RECOMMENDING that the 4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order be Denied. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G. et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezell Anderson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Concannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Keb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?