Battle Creek Alliance v. Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Battle Creek Alliance
Defendant: Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01503
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/7/17: This case is hereby dismissed with prejudice, each side to bear their own attorney fees and costs, except as provided for by the terms of the Settlement Agreement. (Kaminski, H)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of RECUSAL signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/10/2016 ORDERING that the undersigned judge hereby RECUSES himself as the judge to whom this case is assigned. The Clerk of the Court reassign this case to another judge for all further proceedings. Senior Judge William B. Shubb recused. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Mendez for all further proceedings. (Zignago, K.)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/14/2016 continuing the Scheduling Conference to 1/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 1/3/2017. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battle Creek Alliance v. Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Battle Creek Alliance
Represented By: Andrew L. Packard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?