Whitely v. CDCR et al
Plaintiff: Everton Whitely
Defendant: CDCR, D. Calderon and E. Baker
Case Number: 2:2016cv01534
Filed: June 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/25/2019 DENYING as moot plaintiff's 45 motion for an extension of time to file a response and DENYING defendants' 52 motion to strike. IT IS RECOMMENDED that defendants' 38 motion for summary judgment be granted and the Clerk be directed to enter judgment accordingly, and close the case. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/4/2018 GRANTING 48 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants are GRANTED a 23-day extension of time nunc pro tunc, until 12/7/2018, to file a reply to Plaintiff's opposition to 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Huang, H)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/26/18 GRANTING 40 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff has 45 days from the date this order is served to file his opposition. (Coll, A)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/19/18 ORDERING plaintiff is granted additional time to file a reply. He shall file his reply within 21 days of the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/16/2018. Defendants' MOTION for 1-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME 35 is GRANTED. Defendant Baker is granted a one-day extension of time nunc pro tunc, to submit verifications to Plaintiff as ordered by the Courts 6/28/2018 Order 34 . (Cannarozzi, N)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/28/18 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 25 Motion to Compel. (See order for further details.) (Plummer, M)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/29/2017 GRANTING 23 Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline. Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's 10/11/2017 discovery requests within 30 days of the date this order is filed. Plaintiff's motion to compel based on those requests, if any, must be filed within 30 days of his receipt of Defendants' responses. (Henshaw, R)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Everton Whitely signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/21/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to Sacramento Division signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/05/2016.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitely v. CDCR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everton Whitely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?