Ordonez v. Hunt & Henriques, Inc.
Plaintiff: George Ordonez
Defendant: Hunt & Henriques, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01596
Filed: July 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/3/2017 GRANTING 38 Stipulation. George Ordonez and Christian Ordonez shall file a responsive pleading to Defendant's counterclaim by 10/16/2017. (Donati, J)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/20/17 ORDERING that the Request to extend deadline to file responsive pleading to counterclaim is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff and Counterdefendant, GEORGE ORDONEZ, and Counterdefendant, CHRISTIAN ORDONEZ, to file a responsive pleading to Defendant's Counterclaim is hereby EXTENDED to 10/1/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/17/2017 GRANTING 17 Motion to Amend; DENYING 20 Motion for Sanctions; DENYING 8 Motion to Strike as moot. (Michel, G.)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/1/17 ORDERING that the deadline for Plaintiff and Counterdefendant, GEORGE ORDONEZ, and Counterdefendant, CHRISTIAN ORDONEZ, to file a responsive pleading to Defendant's Counterc laim is hereby EXTENDED to thirty (30) days after the Court makes its ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint which was filed on 10/30/16 and Defendant's Motion for Sanctions which was filed on 11/3/16.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/23/2016 ORDERING that the deadline for Plaintiff and Counterdefendant, GEORGE ORDONEZ, and Counterdefendant, CHRISTIAN ORDONEZ, to file a responsive pleading to Defendant's Counterclaim is hereby EXTENDED to 2/2/2017. (Jackson, T)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/16/16. The Deadline for Plaintiff and Counterdefendant, GEORGE ORDONEZ, and Counterdefendant, CHRISTIAN ORDONEZ, to file a responsive pleading to Defendants Counterclaim is hereby EXTENDED to 12/22/2016. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/21/16 ORDERING the deadline for Plaintiff and Counterdefendant, GEORGE ORDONEZ, and Counterdefendant, CHRISTIAN ORDONEZ, to file a responsive pleading to Defendant's Counterclaim is hereby extended to November 10, 2016.(Becknal, R)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/8/16: HEARING as to 8 MOTION to STRIKE RESET for 11/3/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ordonez v. Hunt & Henriques, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Ordonez
Represented By: Therese S. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt & Henriques, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?