John v. County of Sacramento
Plaintiff: John John
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2016cv01640
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/13/2019 RECOMMENDING that 21 Motion to Dismiss be granted in part, 20 Third Amended Complaint be dismissed without further leave to amend, the court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over 20 Third Amended Complaint's state law causes of action, and that this action be closed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Huang, H)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/30/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff show cause in writing within 14 days of the date of this order as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution; The 8/3/2018 hearing of defendant 9;s 21 Motion to dismiss is CONTINUED to 8/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes; on or before 8/10/2018 plaintiff shall file a statement of opposition or non-opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss. (Reader, L)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/22/18, ORDERING that Plaintiff's 16 request to proceed anonymously is DENIED. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a third amended complaint under plaintiff� 39;s real name. Within 21 days of plaintiff's filing the third amended complaint, defendant shall file a responsive pleading. Plaintiff is cautioned that the failure to timely comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed due to a lack of prosecution. (Kastilahn, A)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/24/2018 GRANTING defendant's 11 Motion to Dismiss. The 1/26/2018 hearing of defendant's motion to dismiss is VACATED. Within twenty-eight days from the date of this order, plaintiff s hall either file a motion to proceed anonymously or a third amended complaint under plaintiff's real name. If plaintiff files a third amended complaint under his real name, defendant shall file a responsive pleading within twenty-one days. (Zignago, K.)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/19/2017 ADOPTING 9 Findings and Recommendations in full and DISMISSING Defendant County of Sacramento from this action. (York, M)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/30/2017 ORDERING 6 that Plaintiff's application to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; RECOMMENDING that defendant County of Sacramento be dismissed from this action without granting plaintiff further leave to amend; Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these F & R's.(Reader, L)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/20/17 ORDERING that the Amended Complaint filed 12/22/17 6 is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Within twenty-eight days from the date of this order, a second amended complaint shall be filed that cures the defects noted in this order and complies with the FRCP and the Local Rules of Practice. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/9/2016 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DISMISSING the 1 Complaint with leave to amend; ORDERING the plaintiff to file an amended complaint within twenty-eight days; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that a failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John v. County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?