Reynolds v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jackie Anthony Reynolds
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01652
Filed: July 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/15/2018 GRANTING in part 27 Motion to Strike insofar as the court considers his proposed reply and declaration attached thereto in resolving the pending motions for summary judgment and DENYING in all other respects; The 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and the 21 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; The Commissioner's decision is AFFIRMED. CASE CLOSED. (Fabillaran, J)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/30/17, ORDERING that Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 12/14/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/21/17, ORDERING that Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment is now due on 10/20/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/07/17 ORDERING that the date for the Commissioner to respond to the 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 09/06/17. (Benson, A.)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/23/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment or remand is now due on 6/16/2017.(Becknal, R)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/15/2016 ORDERING that, within 14 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall comply with the court's 7/22/2016 order. Plaintiff is warned that failure to comply with this order will result in the dismissal of this case. (Reader, L)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/21/16 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING the clerk to issue process. Within fourteen days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal the required documents. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty days from the date of this order.(Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Anthony Reynolds
Represented By: Robert Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?