Akins et al v. Seterus, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Kenneth Akins and Bonnie Morris Akins |
Defendant: |
Seterus, Inc., Bank of America N.A and Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv01656 |
Filed: |
July 15, 2016 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Presiding Judge: |
Troy L. Nunley |
Nature of Suit: |
Truth in Lending |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 19, 2021 |
Filing
51
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/18/21 GRANTING without leave to amend 36 Motion to Dismiss. (Kaminski, H)
|
September 6, 2019 |
Filing
34
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/5/19 GRANTING Defendant's Requests for Judicial Notice and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 30 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are granted thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file a Third Amended Complaint. Defendant is afforded twenty-one (21) days from the date Plaintiffs file an amended complaint to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Kaminski, H)
|
December 11, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/8/2017 ACCORDINGLY Defendant's 23 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART; Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date this Order is filed.(Reader, L)
|
February 10, 2017 |
Filing
22
AMENDED ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/10/2017 ORDERING This action shall be STAYED until 3/1/2017; the deadline for responsive pleadings shall be set for 3/31/2017; During the duration of the stay, Defendants shall not foreclose on the property located at 4840 Roselin Way, Elk Grove, CA; All discovery, meet and confer dates, and initial case management dates will be continued a like amount of time to dates consistent with the court's pleasure.(Reader, L)
|
December 8, 2016 |
Filing
19
AMENDED ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/7/2016 ORDERING that this action is STAYED until 1/1/2017. The pending Motion to Dismiss, currently set to be heard on 12/8/2016, is VACATED, to be reset by the moving party at a later dat e. The deadline for responsive pleadings shall be set for 1/31/2017. During the duration of the stay, Defendants shall not foreclose on the property located at 4840 Roselin Way, Elk Grove, California. All discovery, meet and confer dates, and initial case management dates will be continued a like amount of time to dates consistent with the court's pleasure. (Zignago, K.)
|
December 6, 2016 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/5/2016 ORDERING this action shall be STAYED until 1/1/2017; The pending Motion to Dismiss, currently set to be heard on 12/8/2016 is VACATED to be reset by the moving party at a later date; the dead line for responsive pleadings shall be set for 1/31/2017; During the duration of the stay, Defendants shall not take any action to foreclose on the property located at 4840 Roselin Way, Elk Grove, CA; all discovery, meet and confer dates, and initial case management dates will be continued a like amount of time to dates consistent with the court's pleasure. (Reader, L)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?