Monteforte, et al., v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., et al.,
Plaintiff: Lawrence P. Monteforte, Michelle R. Monteforte, En K Cu and Sen Van Nguyen
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA and Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Case Number: 2:2016cv01675
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/7/2017 GRANTING 31 Motion to Dismiss without leave to amend; DISMISSING the 25 First Amended Complaint with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER 32 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/7/2017 extending the deadline for service of initial disclosures to 8/1/2017. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/13/2017 ORDERING that the time for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint shall be and hereby is EXTENDED up to and including 7/5/2017. (Reader, L)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/2/2017 ORDERING Scheduling Conference CONTINUED 3/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; The stay of the action shall remain in place until the date of completion of the VDRP mediation or 90 days from the date of entry of this order, whichever occurs earlier. (Reader, L)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO VDRP AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/29/16, ORDERING that within 14 days of this Order, the parties shall contact the court's VDRP administrator, Sujean Park to start the process of s electing an appropriate neutral. Any party that objects to this referral to the VDRP shall file its objections within seven (7) days of this Order. This action is STAYED to provide the parties time to complete the VDRP session. No later than five (5) days after completion of the VDRP session, the parties shall file a joint statement indicating whether a settlement was reached. The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is RESET for 2/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. If a settlement is not reached through VDRP, the parties shall submit an Amended Joint Status Report no later than 1/30/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM and ORDER re 4 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/14/2016: IT IS ORDERED that defendants' Motion to dismiss plaintiffs' Complaint be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs have twenty days from the date this Order is signed to file an amended complaint, if they can do so consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend the Time Plaintiff Has to Respond to the Motion to Dismiss and to Continue the Hearing Date 10 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/29/2016: Plaintiff's Opposition will be filed by 9/24/2016. Defendants ' Reply Brief to be due on 10/3/2016. The hearing on the 4 Motion to Dismiss is reset for 10/31/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Scheduling Conference is continued from 11/21/2016 to 12/5/2016 at 1:30 p.m. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 11/21/2016. (Kirksey Smith, K)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER 6 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/26/2016 continuing hearing on the 4 MOTION to DISMISS to 10/3/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Plaintiffs Opposition will be filed by Monday, 9/19/2016. Defendants Reply Brief will be due Monday, 9/26/2016. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monteforte, et al., v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence P. Monteforte
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle R. Monteforte
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: En K Cu
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sen Van Nguyen
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA
Represented By: Joshua M. Bryan
Represented By: Brian H. Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Joshua M. Bryan
Represented By: Brian H. Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?